Lam, Michael Chi-Kwok (CPSO#: 59803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9640 Bayview Avenue
Suite 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9P7
Phone: (905) 737-0509
Fax: (905) 737-4889
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 59803 )

Business Address:
2 - 9640 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9P7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0509

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHI-KWOK LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989