Lam, Robert Edwin (CPSO#: 63759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
2W-404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3018
Fax: (416) 597-0836
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert E. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lam ( CPSO# 63759 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
2W-404 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWIN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992