Lam, Simon Rock (CPSO#: 63364)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of London, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005