Lam, Terena Pui-Ting (CPSO#: 72225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
299 Main Street
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone: (705) 752-1004
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terena Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lam ( CPSO# 72225 )

Business Address:
299 Main Street North
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 752-1004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERENA PUI-TING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000