Lam, Wai Fan Fanny (CPSO#: 85989)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 10 May 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 11 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007