Lam, Wai-Ching (CPSO#: 63438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 978-7932
Fax: (416) 978-4590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wai Ching Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. Tel: 416-781-9083 ext. 1
Date Received: 23 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAI-CHING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1991