Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lam, Wendy (CPSO#: 64044)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998