Lamarre, Michelle Ann (CPSO#: 51116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: Lamarre, Michelle (used until: 15 Jul 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Laval University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre de santé communautaire
de Sudbury-Est
44 rue St-Christophe
Noelville ON  P0M 2N0
Phone: (705) 898-2594
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. G. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lopez ( CPSO# 52192 )
Dr. M. Lamarre ( CPSO# 51116 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANN LAMARRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMARRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1985