Lamb, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 65909)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1994