Lamb, Martin Nicholas (CPSO#: 63905)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997