Lamb, Sandra Isabel (CPSO#: 63569)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: McDonald, Sandra Isabel (used until: 21 Oct 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1998