Lamba, Manisha (CPSO#: 51439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Road
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 33374
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manisha Lamba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lamba ( CPSO# 51439 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Road
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISHA LAMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1989