Lamba, Rakesh Krishanlal (CPSO#: 69506)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Gujarat University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 606, 13737 96th Avenue, Surrey, BC, V3V 0C6
Instructions: Records in Ontario were from 1995-1996 and those records are not in possession of the doctor. They are controlled by the respective organizations.
Date Received: 29 Jul 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2016