Lamba, Wiplove Ravindra (CPSO#: 84391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Mental Health Services
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3082
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lamba & Gowda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lamba ( CPSO# 84391 )
Dr. S. Gowda ( CPSO# 96954 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Mental Health Services
30 Bond Street
CC 17 - 045
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3082

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WIPLOVE RAVINDRA LAMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011