Lambert, Andre-Stephane (CPSO#: 62301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Division of Cardiac Anesthesiology
H-2410 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7099
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Stephane Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lambert ( CPSO# 62301 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Anesthesia
H2410 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE-STEPHANE LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991