Lambert, Colin Douglas (CPSO#: 29954)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Attn: Dr. Colin Douglas Lambert St. Michael’s Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, Ontario M5B 1W8
Date Received: 15 Dec 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006