Lambert, Wendy Cindy-Lynn (CPSO#: 67965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital- cancer centre
General campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70166
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lambert ( CPSO# 67965 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 731-7700

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2318

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY CINDY-LYNN LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996