Lambeth, Michelle Allison (CPSO#: 71510)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2007


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2007