Lamenza, Cecilia (CPSO#: 21148)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Colombia, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 39 Edgehill Road Etobicoke, ON M9A 4N1
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015