Lamki, Lamk Mohamed (CPSO#: 20925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1996