Lammens, Peter Nelson (CPSO#: 62599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
660 Golden Ridge Road
#250
Golden CO  80401
United States
Phone: (303) 233-1223
Fax: (303) 233-8755

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER NELSON LAMMENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMMENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991