Lamont, David Archibald (CPSO#: 19169)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology St Joseph's Hospital 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton, Ontario L8N 4A6
Date Received: 29 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012