Lamont, Donald David (CPSO#: 55552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 202
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 495-8854
Fax: (705) 495-0874
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lamont ( CPSO# 55552 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 495-8854

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD DAVID LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1990