Lamont, John Allan (CPSO#: 21101)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 2 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Juravinski Hospital 711 Concession Street Hamilton ON L8V 1C3 Phone: 905-574-8606
Date Received: 28 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016