Lamont, Robert Neil (CPSO#: 57989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7207
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 372-3388
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Neil Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lamont ( CPSO# 57989 )

Business Address:
Suite 7207
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 372-3388

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989