Lamont, Samantha Jane (CPSO#: 84327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Silverlinings Medical Centres Inc.
unit 4
472 Woodlawn rd E
Guelph ON  N1E 1B9
Phone: (519) 821-9449
Fax: (519) 821-9559
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Willow rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1W2
Canada
Phone: 5198292929
Fax: 5198239393
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: 519 822 5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lamont ( CPSO# 84327 )

Business Address:
472 Woodlawn Road East
Guelph ON  N1E 1B9
Phone Number: (519) 821-9449

Business Address:
209-89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 837-1897

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JANE LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009