Lamontagne, Francois (CPSO#: 85623)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009