Lampron, Jacinthe (CPSO#: 79996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10470
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacinthe Lampron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lampron ( CPSO# 79996 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACINTHE LAMPRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMPRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2003 to 20 Sep 2003
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2007