Lamptey, Na-Koshie (CPSO#: 83052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ga

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 5001
300 St Mary's Street
Fredericton NB  E3B 5H1
Phone: (506) 453-2830
Fax: (506) 453-2848

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NA-KOSHIE LAMPTEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMPTEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008