Lamschtein, Claudia (CPSO#: 90054)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the Republic, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2008 to 05 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 06 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010