Lamy, Andre (CPSO#: 69853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D B C V S R I
C1 112
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 522-0175
Fax: (905) 522-2029
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Lamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lamy ( CPSO# 69853 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
DBCVRSI
Room C1-112
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 522-0175

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE LAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1996