Lancaster, Bobbi D (CPSO#: 31711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: Lancaster, Robert Douglas (used until: 13 Feb 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
191 South Catherine Street
Hamilton ON  L8N-2K3
Phone: 905 547 7854
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOBBI D LANCASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANCASTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2018