Landecker, Leslie Stephen (CPSO#: 31238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1979

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, German

Education:University of Cape Town, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixon Medical Centre
531 Davis Drive
Suite 308
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 898-7414
Fax: (905) 898-7792
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Landecker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Landecker ( CPSO# 31238 )

Business Address:
Dixon Medical Centre
Suite 308
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-7414

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE STEPHEN LANDECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDECKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1979

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On November 1, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Landecker.