Landes, Megan Christine (CPSO#: 81302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital Site
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan C. Landes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Landes ( CPSO# 81302 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN CHRISTINE LANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2008