Landine, James Kristopher (CPSO#: 70116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street Empire 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Landine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Landine ( CPSO# 70116 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2335

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
144 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 546-1240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES KRISTOPHER LANDINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001