Landriault, Eric (CPSO#: 73679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104 - 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Landriault Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Landriault ( CPSO# 73679 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-1298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC LANDRIAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDRIAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001