Landry, Jacques (CPSO#: 31087)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 1998