Landy, Joshua Samuel (CPSO#: 87874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua Landy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Landy ( CPSO# 87874 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA SAMUEL LANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 28 Apr 2008 to 16 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011