Lane, David Peter Pasco (CPSO#: 69316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Phone: (705) 320-8080
Fax: (705) 320-8082
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Lane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lane ( CPSO# 69316 )

Business Address:
39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Phone Number: (705) 320-8080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PETER PASCO LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000