Lane, Robert Alan (CPSO#: 29187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-6446
Fax: (905) 697-2552
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ALAN LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1976 to 13 Jun 1977
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2005