Lang, Anthony Edward Thomas (CPSO#: 28326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C L
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5112
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Lang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lang ( CPSO# 28326 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C L
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY EDWARD THOMAS LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1982