Lang, Jefferey Douglas (CPSO#: 62114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 634-0800
Fax: (905) 634-0825
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jefferey D. Lang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lang ( CPSO# 62114 )

Business Address:
3155 Harvester Road
Suite 410
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 634-0800

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFEREY DOUGLAS LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1991