Lang, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 29243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Sunbridge Cres
Kitchener ON  N2K 1T3
Phone: (519) 570-4572
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. J. Lang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2005