Lang, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 91285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-7737
Fax: (705) 360-5733
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014