Langburt, Wayne (CPSO#: 71711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 313
7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone: (905) 707-8343
Fax: (905) 707-8344
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatric Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Canada
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wayne Langburt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Langburt ( CPSO# 71711 )

Business Address:
Suite 313
7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone Number: (905) 707-8343

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 03 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE LANGBURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGBURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998