Langelaan, Robyn (CPSO#: 95139)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston Family Health Organization Suite 200 2437 Princess Street Kingston ON K7M 3G1
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016