Langer, Galina (CPSO#: 52998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W9
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: (905) 881-1721
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GALINA LANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988