Langer, Jacob Charles (CPSO#: 33213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of General & Thoracic Surgery
Room 1524
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202413
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob C. Langer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Langer ( CPSO# 33213 )

Business Address:
Division of General Surgery
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Room 1524
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB CHARLES LANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1988