Langer, Joseph (CPSO#: 17790)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014