Langevitz, Pnina (CPSO#: 59170)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kaunas Medical Institute, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989